U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30165-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moran
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 04, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 03, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 03, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 23, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 15, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 25, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
  • March 24, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 24, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 24, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 24, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 24, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 25, 2021: [Invocation of Rights]
  • February 25, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • February 25, 2021: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 25, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 25, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 22, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 22, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 24, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 10, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 10, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 02, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 10, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 09, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 09, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 26, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • August 22, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • August 22, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 22, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • August 22, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 22, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 22, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 21, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 21, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 24, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 24, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • April 24, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
  • April 21, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
February, 2017
  • February 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • February 08, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 08, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 08, 2017: [Continue]
  • February 08, 2017: [Release from Custody]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 25, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • December 19, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 19, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 15, 2016: [Furlough]
  • December 15, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 15, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • December 14, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 14, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 14, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 07, 2016: [Furlough]
  • December 01, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 30, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 29, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 29, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 29, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • November 29, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 29, 2016: [Request]
  • November 21, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • November 18, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 18, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 17, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 17, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.