U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50160-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hale
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 20, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 20, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • April 14, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 14, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 14, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 06, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 02, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 13, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 13, 2017: [Consent]
  • January 13, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 10, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • January 06, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 06, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 06, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 06, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 06, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 06, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 04, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
December, 2016
  • December 09, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • November 17, 2016: [Text Order]
  • November 17, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 17, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.