U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50159-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garreau
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 16, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 12, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 12, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • May 05, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 05, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 05, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 12, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 16, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 03, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 03, 2017: [Consent]
  • February 03, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 25, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 25, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 25, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 25, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 17, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 04, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • November 18, 2016: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • November 17, 2016: [Text Order]
  • November 17, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 17, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.