U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50150-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Graham
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • January 05, 2022: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
  • January 05, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
July, 2018
  • July 10, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 18, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 17, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • April 12, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 11, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 10, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 10, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 10, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 03, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 22, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • March 14, 2018: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • March 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 08, 2018: [Extend]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • February 23, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2018
  • January 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 04, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2017
  • December 06, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 20, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 20, 2017: [Waiver]
  • November 06, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 06, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 06, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 06, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2017
  • September 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 07, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 07, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 25, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 25, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 19, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 19, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • July 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • July 17, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 17, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 13, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • July 10, 2017: [Reconsideration]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 30, 2017: [Order]
  • June 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Disqualify]
  • June 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 27, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Consent]
  • May 24, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • May 19, 2017: [Disqualify]
  • May 18, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • May 09, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • April 28, 2017: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • April 26, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • April 03, 2017: [Order]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • March 29, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 29, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 22, 2017: [Suppress]
  • March 22, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • March 22, 2017: [Redacted Indictment / Superseding Indictment for Service]
  • March 22, 2017: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • March 22, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 26, 2017: [Suppress]
  • January 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 24, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 24, 2017: [Extend]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • December 27, 2016: [Furlough]
  • December 09, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 06, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 02, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 02, 2016: [Arraignment]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • November 18, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 17, 2016: [Text Order]
  • November 17, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 17, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.