U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50154-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dowty
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion for Order]
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • November 01, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 01, 2022: [For Order]
  • November 01, 2022: [Notice]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
August, 2021
  • August 11, 2021: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Appeal Record Returned]
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [Appeal Record Returned]
October, 2020
  • October 06, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Request]
  • September 29, 2020: [USCA Order]
July, 2020
  • July 06, 2020: [USCA Judgment]
  • July 06, 2020: [USCA Opinion]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Transcript Redaction Request]
  • February 25, 2019: [Transcript Redaction Request]
  • February 06, 2019: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • February 06, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • February 06, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
January, 2019
  • January 03, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • December 28, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 17, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 17, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 17, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • December 17, 2018: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • December 03, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 28, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
August, 2018
  • August 03, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 03, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 03, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
July, 2018
  • July 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
  • July 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
March, 2018
  • March 09, 2018: [Reply to Motion Response]
February, 2018
  • February 07, 2018: [Extend]
  • February 02, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [Extend]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 21, 2017: [Extend]
  • December 13, 2017: [Transcript - Redacted]
November, 2017
  • November 24, 2017: [Extend]
  • November 17, 2017: [New Trial]
  • November 17, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 17, 2017: [Acquittal]
  • November 08, 2017: [Extend]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Extend]
  • October 02, 2017: [Transcript Redaction Request]
September, 2017
  • September 10, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • September 10, 2017: [Transcript of Voir Dire]
  • September 10, 2017: [Transcript]
  • September 08, 2017: [Extend]
August, 2017
  • August 14, 2017: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • August 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 14, 2017: [Continue]
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 21, 2017: [Extend]
  • July 21, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 07, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Extend]
  • May 16, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 09, 2017: [Extend]
  • May 08, 2017: [Order]
  • May 05, 2017: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • May 05, 2017: [Verdict]
  • May 05, 2017: [Jury Question]
  • May 05, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • May 05, 2017: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • May 04, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • May 02, 2017: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • May 02, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • May 02, 2017: [Order]
  • May 01, 2017: [Jury Instructions (Redacted)]
  • May 01, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • May 01, 2017: [Jury List]
  • May 01, 2017: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • May 01, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
April, 2017
  • April 30, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 30, 2017: [Exclude]
  • April 30, 2017: [In Limine]
  • April 27, 2017: [Notice]
  • April 27, 2017: [Supplement]
  • April 21, 2017: [Order]
  • April 21, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 21, 2017: [In Limine]
  • April 20, 2017: [Notice]
  • April 19, 2017: [Reply]
  • April 17, 2017: [Response]
  • April 17, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • April 17, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 13, 2017: [Extend]
  • April 13, 2017: [Response]
  • April 12, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • April 10, 2017: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • April 07, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 07, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 07, 2017: [In Limine]
  • April 05, 2017: [Notice]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • March 24, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 24, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • March 14, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 01, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 01, 2017: [Reconsideration]
January, 2017
  • January 24, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 24, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 24, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 18, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 13, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 09, 2017: [Request]
December, 2016
  • December 09, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 23, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 23, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • November 23, 2016: [Request]
  • November 23, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 23, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 22, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 22, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 22, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 22, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • November 22, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 22, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • November 21, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 18, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 17, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 17, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.