U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50156-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Warthen
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 25, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 17, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 20, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 20, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 20, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 20, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 20, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 20, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 22, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 12, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 08, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 08, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 08, 2019: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 08, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • February 05, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 30, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 30, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 28, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • January 24, 2019: [Forfeiture]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Sealed Order]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Declaration of Publication]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 18, 2018: [Forfeiture]
  • June 18, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2018
  • April 11, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 26, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 20, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • February 14, 2018: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
  • February 14, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 14, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 14, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 14, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 08, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • February 08, 2018: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • February 06, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 19, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 01, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • October 23, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 29, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 29, 2017: [Consent]
  • September 29, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
August, 2017
  • August 18, 2017: [Consent]
  • August 18, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • August 09, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 08, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 08, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 08, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
July, 2017
  • July 11, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2017
  • June 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • May 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • May 31, 2017: [Hearing ]
  • May 31, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 31, 2017: [Continue]
  • May 30, 2017: [Furlough]
  • May 24, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 19, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • May 12, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • May 03, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 03, 2017: [Extend]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 25, 2017: [Suppress]
  • April 11, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • April 10, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 04, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2017
  • March 14, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 14, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 14, 2017: [Request]
  • March 14, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 14, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 14, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 14, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 14, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 14, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 14, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 14, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 14, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 14, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 14, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • March 13, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 13, 2017: [Arrest]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 17, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.