U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50148-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Iron Crow
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 23, 2022: [Hearing]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order re Exhibits]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Transcript]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Extend]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Transcript]
  • September 24, 2021: [Unseal Document]
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [Appeal Record Returned]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Letter]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Letter]
  • January 05, 2021: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • October 01, 2020: [USCA Order]
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: [USCA Judgment]
  • August 17, 2020: [USCA Opinion]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 07, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • July 23, 2019: [Transcript]
  • July 18, 2019: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • July 18, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • July 18, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • June 21, 2019: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • June 21, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • June 20, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 14, 2019: [Order]
  • June 13, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • June 13, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • June 07, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 07, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 07, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 05, 2019: [Continue]
  • June 04, 2019: [Objection]
  • June 03, 2019: [Continue]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 12, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 02, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Psychiatric Report Received]
January, 2019
  • January 15, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
December, 2018
  • December 07, 2018: [Status Conference]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 28, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 21, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 16, 2018: [Competency Report]
September, 2018
  • September 04, 2018: [Order]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Competency Evaluation]
  • August 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
July, 2018
  • July 02, 2018: [Reply to Motion Response]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Continue]
  • June 21, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 18, 2018: [Extend]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Brief]
  • May 14, 2018: [Continue]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • April 18, 2018: [Order]
  • April 10, 2018: [Transcript of Voir Dire]
  • April 10, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • April 10, 2018: [Transcript]
November, 2017
  • November 08, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • November 08, 2017: [Transcript]
October, 2017
  • October 16, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 13, 2017: [Continue]
  • October 13, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 16, 2017: [Order]
July, 2017
  • July 18, 2017: [Reply]
  • July 14, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 13, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 13, 2017: [Document Sealed]
  • July 13, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 13, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • July 13, 2017: [New Trial]
  • July 13, 2017: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • July 13, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 06, 2017: [Order]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • June 30, 2017: [Verdict]
  • June 30, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • June 30, 2017: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • June 30, 2017: [Jury Question]
  • June 29, 2017: [Jury Question]
  • June 29, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • June 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • June 28, 2017: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • June 27, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • June 27, 2017: [Order]
  • June 26, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • June 26, 2017: [Jury List]
  • June 26, 2017: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • June 26, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • June 23, 2017: [Supplement]
  • June 22, 2017: [Notice]
  • June 21, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • June 21, 2017: [Reply]
  • June 20, 2017: [In Limine]
  • June 20, 2017: [Order]
  • June 19, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • June 19, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • June 18, 2017: [Notice]
  • June 17, 2017: [Supplement]
  • June 17, 2017: [Notice]
  • June 16, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 16, 2017: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • June 15, 2017: [Notice]
  • June 13, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • June 13, 2017: [Notice]
  • June 09, 2017: [In Limine]
  • June 09, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • June 06, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 01, 2017: [Notice]
May, 2017
  • May 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • May 10, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 03, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Order Referring Motion]
  • April 24, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • April 21, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 21, 2017: [Compel ]
  • April 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 05, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2017
  • March 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 10, 2017: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • March 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 03, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 27, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 21, 2017: [Request]
  • February 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 13, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • February 12, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 03, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 03, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2017
  • January 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 05, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 05, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 04, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • December 23, 2016: [Withdraw Document]
  • December 21, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 16, 2016: [Text Order]
  • December 16, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • December 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • December 16, 2016: [Furlough]
  • December 16, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 13, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • December 12, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • December 09, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 23, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 23, 2016: [Request]
  • November 23, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 22, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 22, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 22, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 22, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • November 22, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 22, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • November 22, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 18, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 17, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 17, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 17, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.