U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50152-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hansen
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 07, 2018: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • December 07, 2018: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
November, 2018
  • November 09, 2018: [Letter]
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
  • July 14, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • July 10, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 07, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 07, 2017: [Sentencing]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 29, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 29, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 27, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 27, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 15, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 24, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 24, 2017: [Consent]
  • March 24, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 02, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 21, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 21, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2017
  • January 24, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • January 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 06, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 06, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 09, 2016: [Request]
  • December 08, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 05, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 05, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 05, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 05, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 05, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • December 05, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 05, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • December 05, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • December 05, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 05, 2016: [Arrest]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • November 17, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.