U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 12-10140
  • Case Name: Carrie Marie Rath
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 11, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (Text Order)]
  • April 26, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Final Report Following Dismissal]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 15, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • February 15, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • February 15, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case (Text Order) Ch 13]
  • February 15, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 25, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • January 25, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • January 20, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 18, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing]
  • January 05, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Change of Address (Debtor Only) (Text Entry)]
  • January 04, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • January 03, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Change of Address (Debtor Only) (Text Entry)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.