U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50137-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garnier
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 05, 2022: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • July 18, 2022: [Transcript Redaction Request]
  • July 14, 2022: [Transcript - Public]
  • July 14, 2022: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • July 07, 2022: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 07, 2022: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • March 12, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 09, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 02, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 02, 2018: [Sentencing]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • February 23, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 23, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 23, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 22, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 19, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 05, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2017
  • September 12, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • September 07, 2017: [Release from Custody]
  • September 06, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 06, 2017: [Consent]
  • September 06, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 06, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 05, 2017: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 28, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 28, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 28, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 11, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2017
  • July 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 14, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 13, 2017: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • June 09, 2017: [In Limine]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 10, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • May 09, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 18, 2017: [Continue]
  • April 14, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Produce]
March, 2017
  • March 10, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 10, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 08, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
February, 2017
  • February 03, 2017: [Response]
  • February 01, 2017: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Order Referring Motion]
  • January 27, 2017: [Notice]
  • January 26, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 26, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 26, 2017: [Order Referring Motion]
  • January 26, 2017: [Produce ]
  • January 24, 2017: [Text Order]
  • January 24, 2017: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • January 24, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • January 24, 2017: [Response]
  • January 20, 2017: [Request]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • December 15, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 09, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 09, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • December 09, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • December 09, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • December 09, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 09, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 09, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 09, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • December 09, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • December 07, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • November 29, 2016: [Arrest - Other District]
  • November 18, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.