U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 16-10156
  • Case Name: Jess Gerald Wolff and Monica Joyce Wolff
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 05, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • May 05, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Request for Certified Copy]
June, 2017
  • June 08, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 06, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
May, 2017
  • May 04, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
March, 2017
  • March 09, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 07, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 24, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • January 23, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • January 03, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amendment to Schedules or Statements with Notice]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 22, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (deactivated)]
  • November 21, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • November 21, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • November 21, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 21, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • November 21, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 21, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • November 21, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.