U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 16-40494
  • Case Name: James Frederick Henjum
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Closing Case]
March, 2017
  • March 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 08, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Discharging Debtor(s)]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • February 27, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Limited Filers only)]
  • February 16, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 14, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • February 14, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • February 06, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Reaffirmation Agreement (not to be used by attorney not admitted to this federal bar)]
  • January 17, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Reaffirmation Agreement (NOT TO BE USED BY ATTY NOT ADMITTED TO THIS FEDERAL BAR)]
  • January 09, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • January 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 22, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service of Tax Information to Requestor]
  • November 21, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • November 21, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Add Trustee]
  • November 21, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 21, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employee Income Records]
  • November 21, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 21, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
  • November 21, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 21, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 21, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • November 21, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • November 21, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 case upload]
  • November 21, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.