U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:07-cr-40042-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Ness et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Mail Returned]
  • March 26, 2020: [Mail Returned]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 18, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 13, 2018: [Clerk's Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment]
  • November 13, 2018: [Writ of Continuing Garnishment Issued]
  • November 13, 2018: [Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Mail Returned]
  • February 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 23, 2016: [Proposed Order]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Answer of Garnishee]
  • November 21, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 21, 2016: [Clerk's Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment]
  • November 21, 2016: [Writ of Continuing Garnishment Issued]
  • November 21, 2016: [Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.