U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 16-30036
  • Case Name: Dana Dee Gooby
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
April, 2017
  • April 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
March, 2017
  • March 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Approving Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • March 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Support Document]
  • March 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Deadlines]
  • March 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reaffirmation Agreement (not to be used by attorney not admitted to this federal bar)]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Limited Filers only)]
  • February 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Relief from Automatic Stay]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • January 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • January 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • January 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
December, 2016
  • December 06, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 05, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Support Document]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
  • November 23, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 22, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (deactivated)]
  • November 21, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Intention]
  • November 21, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • November 21, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Update Deficiency Deadline(s)]
  • November 21, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • November 21, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • November 21, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
  • November 21, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 21, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 21, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 21, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 21, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • November 21, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • November 21, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • November 21, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.