U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 16-10157
  • Case Name: Chad Dwight Commet and Kimberly Ann Commet
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Closing Case]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Receipt of Filing Fee]
  • January 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • January 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Trustee's Report of Small Dividends/Unclaimed Funds]
  • January 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Allowing Administrative Expense (Text Order)]
December, 2017
  • December 15, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Applications for Compensation]
July, 2017
  • July 01, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Filing Proof of Claim]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Turnover of Property from Debtor]
  • April 20, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Response]
  • April 07, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Turnover of Property from Debtor]
March, 2017
  • March 25, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 23, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
  • March 11, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 08, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Discharging Debtor(s)]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Limited Filers only)]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • January 16, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Reaffirmation Agreement (NOT TO BE USED BY ATTY NOT ADMITTED TO THIS FEDERAL BAR)]
  • January 10, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney]
  • January 09, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
November, 2016
  • November 24, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 23, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employee Income Records]
  • November 23, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • November 23, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 22, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • November 22, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (deactivated)]
  • November 21, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Add Trustee]
  • November 21, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Update Deficiency Deadline(s)]
  • November 21, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Appointment Rejection]
  • November 21, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 21, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • November 21, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.