U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50151-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rupert
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Reply to Motion Response]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Certificate]
  • June 27, 2022: [Request]
  • June 17, 2022: [Response]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • May 20, 2022: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
  • May 17, 2022: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Transcript]
June, 2020
  • June 02, 2020: [Transcript]
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
April, 2018
  • April 02, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
February, 2018
  • February 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Return of Property]
January, 2018
  • January 03, 2018: [Response to Motion]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Extend]
  • December 13, 2017: [Brief]
  • December 13, 2017: [Return of Property]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 29, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 28, 2017: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
  • November 28, 2017: [Allocution Statement]
  • November 27, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 27, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • November 27, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • November 20, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 17, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 17, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 17, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 11, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 08, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • September 01, 2017: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 23, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 23, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • June 23, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 23, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 23, 2017: [Waiver]
  • June 19, 2017: [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851]
  • June 09, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 09, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 09, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 09, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 09, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 26, 2017: [Extend]
  • May 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • May 18, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • May 10, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • May 10, 2017: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 09, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 28, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 28, 2017: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • April 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 31, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 24, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • March 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • March 24, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 21, 2017: [Redacted Document]
  • March 20, 2017: [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851]
  • March 20, 2017: [Furlough]
  • March 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 17, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 17, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 17, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • March 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 10, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
February, 2017
  • February 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 09, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
December, 2016
  • December 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 22, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 22, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 19, 2016: [Request]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 23, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 23, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • November 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 22, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 22, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • November 22, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 22, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • November 22, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.