U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50147-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Solano
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 06, 2020: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • April 06, 2020: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
August, 2018
  • August 06, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 21, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 14, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • May 14, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 10, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 09, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 07, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • May 07, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 07, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 07, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 07, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • March 20, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 16, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2018
  • February 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • February 02, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 01, 2018: [Order Referring Motion]
  • February 01, 2018: [Furlough]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 29, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 29, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 29, 2017: [Consent]
  • December 29, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 29, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
September, 2017
  • September 06, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Amended]
  • September 06, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • September 05, 2017: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 25, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 25, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 25, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
July, 2017
  • July 06, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 22, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 02, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Text Order]
  • May 23, 2017: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • May 23, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • May 23, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
  • May 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 27, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2017
  • March 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 02, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 02, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2017
  • January 09, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 03, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 02, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • December 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • December 02, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 29, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • November 29, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • November 23, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 22, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 22, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • November 22, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 22, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 22, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 22, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • November 21, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 21, 2016: [Arrest]
  • November 21, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.