U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50149-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Poor Bear et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 23, 2023: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 13, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order of Detention]
  • January 12, 2023: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 12, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • January 12, 2023: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 12, 2023: [Consent]
  • January 12, 2023: [Waiver]
  • January 12, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • December 05, 2022: [Forfeiture]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Transcript - Public]
  • October 21, 2022: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • October 03, 2022: [Declaration of Publication]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • August 29, 2022: [Furlough]
  • August 16, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 15, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 12, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 14, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 13, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 13, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 13, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 13, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 09, 2022: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 09, 2022: [Request for Warrant]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Transcript - Redacted]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Transcript Redaction Request]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Redact Transcript]
  • April 26, 2022: [Redact Transcript]
  • April 22, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 21, 2022: [Allocution Statement (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 21, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 20, 2022: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 19, 2022: [Redact Transcript]
  • April 19, 2022: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 14, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • April 06, 2022: [Furlough]
  • April 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 01, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 01, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • April 01, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • April 01, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 01, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 01, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Supplemental Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • March 29, 2022: [Transcript - Public]
  • March 29, 2022: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • March 29, 2022: [Transcript]
  • March 11, 2022: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
  • December 01, 2021: [Transcript - Restricted]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • November 29, 2021: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • November 24, 2021: [Transcript]
  • November 24, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • November 15, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 12, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • November 09, 2021: [Sealed Response to Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 08, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 05, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 04, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 03, 2021: [Extend]
  • November 02, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 20, 2021: [Continue]
  • September 10, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 10, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 10, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • August 30, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • August 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
  • August 16, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 13, 2021: [Forfeiture]
  • August 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • July 29, 2021: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • July 27, 2021: [Text Order]
  • July 27, 2021: [Transcript]
  • July 22, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 15, 2021: [Declaration]
  • July 15, 2021: [New Trial]
  • July 09, 2021: [Redacted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • July 06, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 06, 2021: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
  • July 02, 2021: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • July 02, 2021: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • July 02, 2021: [Verdict]
  • July 02, 2021: [Jury Question]
  • July 02, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • July 02, 2021: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • July 02, 2021: [Jury Instructions]
  • July 01, 2021: [Jury Question]
  • July 01, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions (attorney use)]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • June 28, 2021: [Jury Instructions]
  • June 28, 2021: [Jury List]
  • June 28, 2021: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • June 28, 2021: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • June 28, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • June 27, 2021: [Objection]
  • June 25, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • June 25, 2021: [Pretrial Conference]
  • June 25, 2021: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • June 23, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • June 23, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • June 22, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • June 18, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • June 18, 2021: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • June 17, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • June 16, 2021: [Response]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 15, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • June 15, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • June 14, 2021: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • June 14, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 11, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions (attorney use)]
  • June 11, 2021: [In Limine]
  • June 10, 2021: [In Limine]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • June 07, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • May 27, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case & Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 26, 2021: [Notice]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
November, 2020
  • November 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 23, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • October 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
September, 2020
  • September 08, 2020: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • September 04, 2020: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Extend]
  • August 24, 2020: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • August 20, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • August 20, 2020: [USCA Judgment]
  • August 18, 2020: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • August 18, 2020: [Request]
  • August 17, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • August 14, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • August 14, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • August 14, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 04, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Sealed Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • July 31, 2020: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • July 31, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • July 31, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • July 31, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 30, 2020: [Transcript]
  • July 29, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 29, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 13, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 13, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 13, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Supplement]
  • June 16, 2020: [Consent]
  • June 15, 2020: [Extend]
  • June 08, 2020: [Brief]
  • June 04, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • June 02, 2020: [Order Referring Motion]
  • June 02, 2020: [Furlough]
  • June 01, 2020: [Transcript]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • May 28, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 27, 2020: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • May 26, 2020: [Continue]
  • May 20, 2020: [Sealed Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • May 20, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • May 20, 2020: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • May 15, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • April 29, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 14, 2020: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • April 07, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 01, 2020: [Continue]
  • April 01, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 26, 2020: [Continue]
  • March 20, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 20, 2020: [Consent]
  • March 20, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 16, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 11, 2020: [Extend]
  • March 06, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 04, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 04, 2020: [Suppress]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 27, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 27, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 27, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 12, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 26, 2019: [Continue]
  • November 25, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • November 08, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 08, 2019: [Arraignment]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • October 23, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 09, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 02, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 26, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 25, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 25, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 16, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 18, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • June 11, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 11, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 07, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 07, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 07, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 09, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • May 06, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 25, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • April 24, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 24, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 17, 2019: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • April 17, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • April 15, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • April 12, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • April 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • April 12, 2019: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • April 09, 2019: [Revoke]
  • April 08, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges]
  • April 04, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 04, 2019: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • April 04, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 03, 2019: [Extend]
  • April 03, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • April 03, 2019: [Response]
  • April 03, 2019: [Notice]
  • April 03, 2019: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 02, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • April 01, 2019: [Response]
  • April 01, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
March, 2019
  • March 31, 2019: [In Limine]
  • March 29, 2019: [Joinder]
  • March 29, 2019: [In Limine]
  • March 28, 2019: [Joinder]
  • March 28, 2019: [Continue]
  • March 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 28, 2019: [Extend]
  • March 27, 2019: [Notice]
  • March 27, 2019: [In Limine]
  • March 27, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • March 25, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • March 25, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • March 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 22, 2019: [Response]
  • March 22, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • March 22, 2019: [Continue]
  • March 21, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • March 21, 2019: [Dismiss Count]
  • March 21, 2019: [In Limine]
  • March 20, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • March 12, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • March 11, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 18, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 16, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 16, 2019: [Objection]
  • January 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • January 04, 2019: [Order Referring Motion]
  • January 03, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 03, 2019: [Bill of Particulars]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 28, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 21, 2018: [Consent]
  • December 21, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • December 13, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 12, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 12, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 12, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • November 28, 2018: [Redacted Document]
  • November 27, 2018: [Release from Custody]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 30, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 30, 2018: [Remark]
  • October 30, 2018: [Count(s) Renumbered]
  • October 30, 2018: [Add Counts - Indictment]
  • October 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • October 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 11, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 11, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2018
  • September 04, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
August, 2018
  • August 03, 2018: [Joinder]
June, 2018
  • June 05, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2018
  • March 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 14, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 23, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 19, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 17, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • January 17, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • October 16, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • October 16, 2017: [Transcript]
  • October 09, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • July 26, 2017: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • July 25, 2017: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
  • July 20, 2017: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
  • July 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 19, 2017: [Subpoena Issued]
  • July 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Subpoena(s)]
  • July 19, 2017: [Subpoena(s)]
  • July 19, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • July 18, 2017: [Continue]
  • July 18, 2017: [Subpoena Issued]
  • July 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Subpoena(s)]
  • July 12, 2017: [Subpoena(s)]
  • July 10, 2017: [Subpoena(s)]
June, 2017
  • June 21, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 21, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 19, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • June 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 08, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 07, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 24, 2017: [Extend]
  • May 24, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 18, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 18, 2017: [Furlough]
  • May 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 15, 2017: [Extend]
  • May 10, 2017: [For Order]
  • May 10, 2017: [Suppress]
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 17, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 11, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 27, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2017
  • February 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • February 01, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Furlough]
  • January 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • January 09, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 07, 2017: [Furlough]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 20, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 12, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 09, 2016: [For Order]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 23, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 22, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 22, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 22, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • November 22, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 22, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 22, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • November 22, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 21, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 21, 2016: [Arrest]
  • November 21, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.