U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50146-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Big Boy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 15, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • October 14, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 14, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 14, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 14, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 12, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
  • December 07, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 07, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 07, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 07, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • September 07, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 07, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • March 08, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 08, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 07, 2018: [Sentencing]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 28, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 28, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 27, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 13, 2018: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • February 13, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • February 07, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • November 22, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 09, 2017: [Order Referring Motion]
  • November 09, 2017: [Furlough]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 20, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 20, 2017: [Consent]
  • October 20, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 11, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 11, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 11, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 11, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 06, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 22, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 29, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • July 20, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • July 19, 2017: [Reconsideration]
June, 2017
  • June 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2017
  • March 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 01, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 01, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2017
  • February 13, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 13, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 19, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 16, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 14, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 13, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 22, 2016: [Request]
  • November 22, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 22, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 22, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 22, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 22, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • November 22, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 22, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • November 21, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 21, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 21, 2016: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.