U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 16-30037
  • Case Name: Timothy Michael Jones
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
  • June 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Close Adversary Case]
April, 2017
  • April 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Complaint]
March, 2017
  • March 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
January, 2017
  • January 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Change of Address (Debtor Only) (Text Entry)]
  • January 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • January 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
December, 2016
  • December 08, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amendment to Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • December 04, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
November, 2016
  • November 24, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 22, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • November 22, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • November 22, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (deactivated)]
  • November 22, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (deactivated)]
  • November 21, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • November 21, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
  • November 21, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 21, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 21, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 21, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 21, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • November 21, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • November 21, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • November 21, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.