U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 16-01019
  • Case Name: First State Bank of Claremont v. Heitmann
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 09, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • March 08, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Stipulation for Dismissal]
  • March 06, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Stipulation for Dismissal]
  • February 16, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes (New)]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • January 19, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Scheduling Order (pre-trial/trial)]
  • December 19, 2016: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Certificate of Service (Summons & Complaint)]
  • November 22, 2016: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Corrective Entry]
  • November 22, 2016: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • November 21, 2016: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • November 21, 2016: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.