U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30148-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Condon et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Receipt]
  • July 11, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • May 16, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
  • May 16, 2019: [USCA Opinion]
April, 2019
  • April 01, 2019: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • February 08, 2018: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • February 05, 2018: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • February 05, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • February 05, 2018: [Transcript]
  • February 02, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • February 02, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • February 02, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • January 17, 2018: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • January 16, 2018: [Court Reporter Information]
  • January 16, 2018: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • January 16, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • January 16, 2018: [Appeal from Magistrate Judge Conviction and/or Sentence]
  • January 03, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 03, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 03, 2018: [Sentencing]
December, 2017
  • December 11, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 11, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 11, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 27, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 03, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • October 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
  • October 19, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 10, 2017: [Reply]
  • October 04, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 03, 2017: [Extend]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 26, 2017: [Acquittal]
  • September 19, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 18, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • September 18, 2017: [Judgment of Acquittal]
  • September 15, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • September 15, 2017: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • September 15, 2017: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • September 15, 2017: [Verdict]
  • September 14, 2017: [Response to Jury Question]
  • September 14, 2017: [Jury Question]
  • September 14, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • September 13, 2017: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • September 13, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • September 13, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • September 13, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • September 12, 2017: [Jury Instructions]
  • September 12, 2017: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • September 12, 2017: [Jury List]
  • September 12, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 12, 2017: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • September 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 11, 2017: [In Limine]
  • September 11, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • September 11, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • September 11, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 11, 2017: [Joinder]
  • September 08, 2017: [Objection]
  • September 08, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • September 08, 2017: [Witness List]
  • September 05, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 05, 2017: [Joinder]
  • September 05, 2017: [In Limine]
  • September 05, 2017: [Notice]
  • September 05, 2017: [Brief]
  • September 05, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 29, 2017: [Request]
  • August 28, 2017: [Request]
  • August 18, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • August 16, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 15, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • August 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Jury List]
  • August 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 03, 2017: [Jury List]
  • August 02, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • July 28, 2017: [Release from Custody]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 23, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 22, 2017: [Consent]
  • May 15, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 28, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • April 28, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • April 28, 2017: [Consent]
  • April 28, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 25, 2017: [Order]
  • April 21, 2017: [Order]
  • April 20, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 20, 2017: [Order]
March, 2017
  • March 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 10, 2017: [Consent]
  • March 10, 2017: [Continue]
  • March 09, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 09, 2017: [Consent]
January, 2017
  • January 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 09, 2017: [Consent]
  • January 09, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 13, 2016: [Request]
  • December 13, 2016: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • December 13, 2016: [Arraignment]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Order]
  • November 23, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • November 23, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 22, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 22, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • November 22, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 22, 2016: [Request]
  • November 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 22, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 22, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 22, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 22, 2016: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • November 22, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 22, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 22, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 22, 2016: [Arrest]
  • November 21, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.