U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 16-30038
  • Case Name: Amanda Kay Waite and Elizabeth Hannelore Waite
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
March, 2017
  • March 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
January, 2017
  • January 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • January 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 28, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Exemption from Financial Managment Course]
  • December 15, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
  • December 15, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Motion/Application (Sets Objection Deadline Only)]
  • December 14, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Waiver of Financial Management Course]
  • December 12, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement Re: Death/Incompetency of Debtor]
November, 2016
  • November 24, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 22, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • November 22, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • November 22, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • November 22, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
  • November 22, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 22, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 22, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 22, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 22, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • November 22, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • November 22, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • November 22, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.