U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 16-50286
  • Case Name: Cynthia Rae Derrek
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 13, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 11, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
April, 2017
  • April 12, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 10, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
March, 2017
  • March 26, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Approving Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • March 23, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Limited Filers only)]
  • February 10, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 08, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing]
  • February 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reaffirmation Agreement (not to be used by attorney not admitted to this federal bar)]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • January 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • January 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 14, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amendment to Schedules or Statements with Notice]
November, 2016
  • November 24, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 23, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (deactivated)]
  • November 22, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • November 22, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • November 22, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • November 22, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • November 22, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 22, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 22, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.