U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 16-10158
  • Case Name: Justin David Shultis
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 24, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 21, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • May 19, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • May 15, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Trustee Following Conversion (Text Order)]
  • May 15, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Trustee's Final Report Following Conversion]
  • May 06, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Supplement Schedule I and/or J]
  • May 06, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Supplement Schedule I and/or J]
  • May 04, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Intention]
  • May 04, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Intention]
  • May 04, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1)/Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • May 04, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1)/Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 23, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 22, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 22, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 21, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • April 21, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • April 21, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • April 21, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • April 21, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • April 21, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • April 21, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Voluntary Conversion by Debtor(s) to Chapter 7 (fee required)]
  • April 21, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Voluntary Conversion by Debtor(s) to Chapter 7 (fee required)]
  • April 21, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 21, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 21, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 21, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Substitute Attorney]
  • April 21, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Substitute Attorney]
  • April 21, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Substitute Attorney]
January, 2019
  • January 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay]
December, 2018
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Motion/Application (Sets Objection Deadline Only)]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Motion/Application (Sets Objection Deadline Only)]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
August, 2018
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Withdrawal of Claim]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
July, 2017
  • July 09, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 07, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay]
June, 2017
  • June 19, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • June 19, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
April, 2017
  • April 16, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 14, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • April 11, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 30, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 28, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay]
  • March 20, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • March 09, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 08, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 08, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 08, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • March 07, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay]
  • March 06, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay]
  • March 03, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 01, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 01, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • March 01, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • March 01, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - No Hrng (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • March 01, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay]
  • February 18, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 17, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 16, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • February 16, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • February 15, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • February 15, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • February 15, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay]
  • February 14, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • February 14, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • February 07, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • February 07, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • February 01, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • January 26, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 25, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • January 25, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • January 25, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 25, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • January 24, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • January 24, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • January 24, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 23, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • January 22, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 21, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 20, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • January 19, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 19, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Deadlines]
  • January 19, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Nonstandard Motion (PRIOR COURT APPROVAL REQUIRED)]
  • January 18, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • January 18, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Returned Mail]
  • January 14, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 12, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • January 12, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 12, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Deadlines]
  • January 12, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Nonstandard Motion (PRIOR COURT APPROVAL REQUIRED)]
  • January 11, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • January 11, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Late Notice]
  • January 11, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 11, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • January 11, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amendment to Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • January 10, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • January 10, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • January 09, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Withdrawal of Claim]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 28, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement Re: Undeliverable or Returned Mail]
  • December 20, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
  • December 19, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • December 06, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 06, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • December 01, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service of Tax Information to Requestor]
November, 2016
  • November 25, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 23, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • November 22, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • November 22, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • November 22, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 22, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • November 22, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 22, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.