U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:12-cr-50079-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Blackburn
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • January 16, 2020: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Order on Request for Early Termination]
  • March 15, 2018: [Request for Early Termination]
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 23, 2016: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.