U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:11-cr-30002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McGhee
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 28, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 23, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
November, 2018
  • November 07, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 06, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 29, 2018: [Order]
  • August 29, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 29, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 29, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 28, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • August 21, 2018: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 09, 2018: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 08, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 08, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • June 08, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 08, 2018: [Order]
  • June 08, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 08, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 08, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 08, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 06, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2017
  • December 11, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 11, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 26, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 26, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Order]
  • June 28, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 28, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 28, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 27, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 27, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • June 13, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 08, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 08, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 08, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 08, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 24, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 12, 2017: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 12, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 06, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 21, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 14, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 14, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • December 14, 2016: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • December 14, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 08, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 02, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 02, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • December 02, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 02, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 02, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 28, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 28, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 28, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 28, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 28, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • November 28, 2016: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • November 23, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.