U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 16-40500
  • Case Name: Kory John Kellen and Kea Ann Kellen
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • June 23, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Request for Certified Copy]
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 11, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
March, 2017
  • March 09, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 07, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • March 01, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reaffirmation Agreement (not to be used by attorney not admitted to this federal bar)]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 23, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • January 10, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 03, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • January 03, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
December, 2016
  • December 16, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 28, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • November 28, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Venue Change]
  • November 23, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • November 23, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 23, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • November 23, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • November 23, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 23, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.