U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:10-cr-30001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McGhee, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Order on Request for Early Termination]
  • January 25, 2017: [Request for Early Termination]
December, 2016
  • December 08, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 02, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 02, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • December 02, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 02, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 02, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 28, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 28, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 28, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • November 28, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 28, 2016: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • November 28, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.