U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cv-05107
  • Case Name: Alquist v. Money
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 01, 2017: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • February 01, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 28, 2016: [PHV Fee Paid]
  • November 28, 2016: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 28, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • November 28, 2016: [Filing Fee Received]
  • November 28, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • November 28, 2016: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.