U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 16-50291
  • Case Name: Rockie Lee Smith and Susan Marie Smith
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Case Reassigned]
November, 2018
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Motion/Application (Sets Objection Deadline Only)]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • July 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan as Confirmed]
  • July 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - Hrng Held (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • July 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Substitute Attorney]
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • June 26, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • June 26, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • June 22, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • June 22, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Court's Exhibit and Witness List]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Brief]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Exhibit and/or Witness List]
May, 2018
  • May 20, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • May 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
April, 2018
  • April 16, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing]
  • April 12, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 12, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Supplement Schedule I and/or J]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Motion/Application (Sets Objection Deadline Only)]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
March, 2018
  • March 08, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 08, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Request for Audio of Hearing]
  • March 03, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 01, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Denying Confirmation of Plan]
  • March 01, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Nonstandard Order]
  • March 01, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Support Document]
  • February 21, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • February 20, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
January, 2018
  • January 23, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • January 23, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing]
  • January 23, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 23, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • January 22, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • January 22, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan/Modified Plan]
  • January 08, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Court's Exhibit and Witness List]
  • November 15, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • November 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • November 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Brief]
  • November 09, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Exhibit and/or Witness List]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Evidentiary Hearing]
  • September 27, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of No Objection (Text Entry)]
  • September 27, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing]
  • September 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Evidentiary Hearing]
  • September 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • September 15, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Status Conference]
  • September 15, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing]
  • September 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Exhibit and/or Witness List]
August, 2017
  • August 18, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Evidentiary Hearing]
  • August 17, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • August 08, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
May, 2017
  • May 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing]
  • May 18, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • May 18, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • May 15, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Adversary Case]
  • May 12, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • May 12, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • May 12, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
  • May 01, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Motion/Application (Sets Objection Deadline Only)]
  • May 01, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • May 01, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
April, 2017
  • April 11, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing]
  • April 10, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • April 10, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
  • March 23, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • March 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • March 17, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 15, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Denial of Discharge]
  • March 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • March 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Summons Service Unexecuted]
  • March 13, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Complaint]
  • March 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing]
  • March 03, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objecting to Discharge]
  • February 23, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • February 15, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • February 15, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • February 09, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Debtor(s) Claim of Exemptions]
  • February 02, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objecting to Discharge (Rule 4004)]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • January 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • January 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • January 18, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • January 10, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • December 30, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • December 30, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • December 30, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1)/Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • December 30, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • December 30, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor(s) Declaration Concerning Schedules]
  • December 30, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedules A-J]
  • December 30, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • December 22, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 20, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • December 20, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (Text Order)]
  • December 20, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 12, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (No Notice)]
  • December 01, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • November 29, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • November 29, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (deactivated)]
  • November 29, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (deactivated)]
  • November 28, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 28, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 28, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 28, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 28, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • November 28, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • November 28, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • November 28, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.