U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 16-05009
  • Case Name: Ace Oilfield Rentals, LLC v. Kerkvliet
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Exhibits Destroyed]
  • June 11, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
  • June 07, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
May, 2019
  • May 07, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Appeal Order - BAP re: Appeal]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Appellee Designation]
  • March 07, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Certification of No Transcript Ordered]
  • March 07, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Statement of Issues on Appeal]
  • March 07, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Appellant Designation]
  • March 01, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Appeal - Acknowledgment of Docketing Notice of Appeal]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Appeal - Transmittal to BAP (Text Entry)]
  • February 21, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • February 21, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election (fee required)]
  • February 07, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Nonstandard Order]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Brief]
  • October 25, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Brief]
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 12, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • September 07, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Court's Exhibit and Witness List]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • August 31, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • August 28, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Response]
  • August 27, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Set Hearing/Deadlines/Trial]
  • August 27, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Exhibit and/or Witness List]
  • August 27, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Nonstandard Motion (PRIOR COURT APPROVAL REQUIRED)]
  • August 24, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Brief]
  • August 23, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Exhibit and/or Witness List]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena(s)]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Reschedule (pre-trial/trial)]
  • May 17, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • May 09, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Reschedule (pre-trial/trial)]
  • May 09, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Reschedule Hearing]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • February 28, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Reschedule (pre-trial/trial)]
  • February 26, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Set Deadlines/Hearing]
  • February 23, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Reschedule (Pre)Trial/Hearing]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Set Deadlines/Hearing]
  • January 25, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes (New)]
December, 2017
  • December 05, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 05, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Set Deadlines/Hearing]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Response]
  • November 09, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Set Deadlines/Hearing]
  • November 08, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Reply]
  • October 13, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Objection]
  • October 04, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Set Deadlines/Hearing]
  • October 03, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Extend Time]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Support Document]
  • September 01, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • September 01, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Set Deadlines/Hearing]
  • September 01, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Transcript (Depositions and 2004 Exams Only)]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Set Deadlines/Hearing]
  • July 26, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • July 14, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Transcript (Depositions and 2004 Exams Only)]
June, 2017
  • June 21, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Reschedule (pre-trial/trial)]
  • June 21, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • June 14, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 14, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Subpoena]
  • June 14, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • June 14, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena(s)]
  • June 08, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Notice to Take Deposition]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • May 12, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Response to Request for Admissions/Production of Documents]
  • May 02, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Reply]
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Answer (Amended)]
  • April 21, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Amend Pleading]
  • April 11, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Response to Request for Admissions/Production of Documents]
  • April 10, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Set Deadlines/Hearing]
  • April 10, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Amend Pleading]
  • April 10, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Extend Time]
March, 2017
  • March 08, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Request for Production of Documents]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Response]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • January 18, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Request for Production of Documents]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Scheduling Order (pre-trial/trial)]
  • December 29, 2016: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 29, 2016: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 29, 2016: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Certificate of Service (Summons & Complaint)]
  • November 30, 2016: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • November 30, 2016: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • November 30, 2016: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.