U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 16-10162
  • Case Name: Andrew David Ries
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
December, 2017
  • December 01, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 01, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 01, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Trustee's Report of Small Dividends/Unclaimed Funds]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • November 29, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Allowing Administrative Expense (Text Order)]
  • November 29, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service of TFR (Used only by Ch 7 Trustee)]
  • November 29, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Applications for Compensation (Without Notice)]
October, 2017
  • October 02, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Withdrawal of Document]
  • September 27, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 25, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing]
  • September 22, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 20, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • September 20, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • September 19, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amendment to Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • September 19, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Objection]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Turnover of Property from Debtor]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney]
July, 2017
  • July 12, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 10, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
March, 2017
  • March 09, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 07, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
February, 2017
  • February 20, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Limited Filers only)]
  • February 03, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 03, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • January 30, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reaffirmation Agreement (not to be used by attorney not admitted to this federal bar)]
  • January 03, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
December, 2016
  • December 11, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 09, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Late Notice]
  • December 09, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 09, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amendment to Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • December 07, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amendment to Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • December 06, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • December 03, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 01, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 01, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • December 01, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • December 01, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • December 01, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 01, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 01, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 01, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • December 01, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.