U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 16-10163
  • Case Name: Gary Lee Hagstrom
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Case Closed Without a Discharge]
  • October 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Closing Case]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
June, 2022
  • June 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Notice of Completion of Plan Payments]
July, 2017
  • July 23, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 21, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
June, 2017
  • June 21, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • June 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reminder for Filing Application for Fees]
May, 2017
  • May 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 11, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • May 11, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan as Confirmed]
  • May 11, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - Hrng Held (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • May 11, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
  • May 11, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Order Request]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • April 06, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
March, 2017
  • March 06, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
February, 2017
  • February 20, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Limited Filers only)]
  • February 18, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 16, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • February 16, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • February 03, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • January 27, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 27, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • January 25, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • January 25, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • January 18, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • December 20, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
  • December 19, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • December 07, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor(s) Statement Regarding Business Records]
  • December 03, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 01, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 01, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • December 01, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • December 01, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • December 01, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 01, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 01, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.