U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cv-03045
  • Case Name: Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company v. Nachtigal Farms, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 05, 2018: [Judgment]
  • April 04, 2018: [Dismiss]
November, 2017
  • November 14, 2017: [Order for Discovery Report]
  • November 14, 2017: [Order]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 18, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • October 17, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • October 02, 2017: [Stipulation]
July, 2017
  • July 12, 2017: [Return of Service Executed]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 22, 2017: [Order for Discovery Report]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 21, 2016: [Extend]
  • December 20, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 20, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 02, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • December 02, 2016: [Filing Fee Received]
  • December 02, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • December 02, 2016: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.