U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:04-cr-30014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fuller
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 04, 2019: [Appeal Record Returned]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [USCA Judgment]
  • December 27, 2018: [USCA Opinion]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [Letter]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
  • June 06, 2018: [USCA Judgment]
  • June 06, 2018: [USCA Opinion]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • April 24, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • April 24, 2018: [Transcript]
  • April 05, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • April 05, 2018: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 02, 2018: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 26, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 22, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 22, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 22, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 22, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • March 22, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 22, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 22, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 21, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • March 21, 2018: [Continue]
  • March 20, 2018: [Notice]
  • March 19, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • March 15, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • March 15, 2018: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • March 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 15, 2018: [Furlough]
  • March 14, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 13, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 12, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 09, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 09, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 09, 2018: [Order]
  • March 09, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 08, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 08, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 08, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 08, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 08, 2018: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
May, 2017
  • May 04, 2017: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • March 28, 2017: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • March 27, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • March 27, 2017: [Transcript]
  • March 27, 2017: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • March 24, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • March 24, 2017: [Transcript]
  • March 23, 2017: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • March 06, 2017: [Notice]
  • March 03, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • March 01, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • March 01, 2017: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • February 27, 2017: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • February 27, 2017: [Court Reporter Information]
  • February 27, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • February 17, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 16, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 16, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 16, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 15, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 14, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 03, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 03, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • February 02, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 02, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • February 02, 2017: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • February 02, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • February 02, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • February 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • February 01, 2017: [Furlough]
January, 2017
  • January 11, 2017: [Order]
  • January 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • January 06, 2017: [Furlough]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • December 29, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • December 29, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 21, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 21, 2016: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • December 14, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 14, 2016: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 14, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • December 14, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 14, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 14, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 14, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • December 13, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 13, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 12, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 12, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 12, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 02, 2016: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.