U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 16-50295
  • Case Name: Jennifer Marie Smith
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 09, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (Text Order)]
  • July 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Final Report Following Dismissal]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 20, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • March 20, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case (Text Order) Ch 13]
  • March 20, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
February, 2017
  • February 13, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • February 13, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • February 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • February 03, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 01, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • February 01, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • February 01, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • January 11, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Hearing (For Confirmations, Obj to Claims and Withdraw as Atty (LBR 2091-1(b)) ONLY)]
  • January 11, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (Text Order)]
  • January 10, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amendment to Petition with Notice]
  • January 10, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • January 05, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • January 05, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • January 05, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
  • January 05, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income Form 122C-2]
  • January 05, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • January 05, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • January 05, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedules A-J]
  • January 03, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (No Notice)]
December, 2016
  • December 23, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (Text Order)]
  • December 15, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (No Notice)]
  • December 09, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 05, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (deactivated)]
  • December 04, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 02, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • December 02, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 02, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • December 02, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • December 02, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 02, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 02, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.