U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 16-50296
  • Case Name: Nicole Dawn White Bear Claws
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
  • March 15, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (Text Order)]
  • March 02, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 01, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • February 28, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Dismiss Case]
  • February 04, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 03, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Dismiss Case]
  • February 01, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
January, 2017
  • January 11, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
December, 2016
  • December 07, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 05, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • December 05, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • December 02, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
  • December 02, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 02, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 02, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 02, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.