U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 16-40510
  • Case Name: Brenda Lynn Stange
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
  • January 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (Text Order)]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds]
  • December 18, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 16, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Dismissal]
  • December 16, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Dismissing Case]
  • December 13, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Response]
  • December 08, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 07, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 06, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (deactivated)]
  • December 05, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • December 05, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Show Cause in Lieu of Dismissal]
  • December 05, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Add Trustee]
  • December 05, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 05, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 05, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • December 05, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • December 05, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 05, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employee Income Records]
  • December 05, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 05, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
  • December 05, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 05, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 05, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 case upload]
  • December 05, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.