U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30146-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DeHorse
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • August 07, 2019: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
September, 2018
  • September 05, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
  • August 08, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
  • July 18, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
  • July 05, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
June, 2018
  • June 11, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
  • May 16, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
March, 2018
  • March 19, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
November, 2017
  • November 08, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • October 04, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 19, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 18, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • September 11, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 11, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 11, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • September 11, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 01, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 08, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • June 28, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 15, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 14, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 13, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • June 13, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 13, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 13, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 13, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 13, 2017: [Revoke]
April, 2017
  • April 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 04, 2017: [Consent]
  • April 04, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 04, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Order]
  • March 24, 2017: [Request]
  • March 23, 2017: [Request]
  • March 22, 2017: [Stipulation]
February, 2017
  • February 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 02, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 02, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 19, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 19, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 12, 2016: [Order]
  • December 07, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 06, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 06, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 06, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 06, 2016: [Request]
  • December 06, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • December 06, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 06, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 06, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 06, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 06, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 06, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • December 05, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 05, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 05, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 05, 2016: [Arrest]
  • December 05, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 05, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • December 05, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 05, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.