U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40129-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McKenzie
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • April 16, 2020: [Forfeiture]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Declaration of Publication]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
February, 2018
  • February 06, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 06, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 05, 2018: [Sentencing]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 29, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 29, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 29, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 29, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • December 26, 2017: [Forfeiture]
  • December 22, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 21, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 18, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2017
  • November 02, 2017: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
  • November 02, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 02, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 01, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 31, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 31, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 03, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 26, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 22, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • September 22, 2017: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • September 22, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 22, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • September 22, 2017: [Transcript]
  • September 20, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 19, 2017: [Appeal from Magistrate Judge Decision]
  • September 11, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • September 11, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 11, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • September 07, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 06, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • September 06, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 06, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 08, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2017
  • June 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 20, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 21, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2017
  • January 12, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 28, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 09, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 09, 2016: [Request]
  • December 09, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 08, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 08, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 08, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 08, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 08, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 08, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • December 08, 2016: [Arrest]
  • December 08, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • December 08, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 06, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • December 06, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.