U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40131-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thayer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Supplement]
July, 2020
  • July 02, 2020: [Response]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • June 25, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 22, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • June 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 22, 2020: [Extend]
  • June 17, 2020: [Response]
  • June 08, 2020: [Supplement]
  • June 08, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 08, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • May 19, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 27, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 27, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • November 27, 2017: [Allocution Statement]
  • November 21, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 20, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 20, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 20, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 20, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 02, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 28, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 24, 2017: [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851]
  • August 15, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 15, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 15, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 15, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 11, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2017
  • June 12, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 30, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2017
  • February 15, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 07, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • January 18, 2017: [Discovery]
  • January 17, 2017: [Response]
  • January 17, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 13, 2017: [Response]
  • January 11, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 03, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 16, 2016: [Request]
  • December 16, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 14, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 13, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 13, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 13, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 13, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • December 13, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 13, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 13, 2016: [Arrest]
  • December 13, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 13, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • December 12, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 06, 2016: [Indictment]
  • December 06, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.