U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40127-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mercado-Villegas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 30, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 30, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • January 17, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 17, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 10, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 09, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 04, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2016
  • December 14, 2016: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • December 14, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 14, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 12, 2016: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • December 07, 2016: [Oral Order]
  • December 06, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • December 06, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.