U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50163-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Featherman et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order re Exhibits]
April, 2020
  • April 14, 2020: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
  • April 03, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
  • March 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • March 05, 2020: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
January, 2020
  • January 10, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • November 15, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • November 12, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 08, 2019: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • November 08, 2019: [Order]
  • November 08, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 08, 2019: [Sentencing]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Appeal Record Returned]
  • October 29, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • October 28, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 25, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 25, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 25, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 17, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 17, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 15, 2019: [Extend]
  • October 11, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 11, 2019: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • October 09, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 08, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 07, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2019
  • September 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • September 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • August 22, 2019: [Extend]
  • August 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 19, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 19, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 15, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
  • August 13, 2019: [Order Referring Motion]
  • August 13, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 13, 2019: [Disclosure ]
  • August 12, 2019: [Order Referring Motion]
  • August 08, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 08, 2019: [Disclosure ]
  • August 07, 2019: [Extend]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 30, 2019: [Bill of Particulars]
  • July 22, 2019: [Ex Parte Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • July 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • July 02, 2019: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • June 21, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
  • June 21, 2019: [USCA Opinion]
  • June 12, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 11, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • June 07, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 06, 2019: [Joinder]
  • June 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • April 01, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 01, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 01, 2019: [Joinder]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 25, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
  • February 01, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 01, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 29, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • January 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • January 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 15, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 07, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 06, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • December 03, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • December 03, 2018: [Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • November 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • November 28, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 27, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 27, 2018: [Case Reopened]
  • November 27, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • November 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • November 21, 2018: [Release from Custody]
  • November 21, 2018: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • November 16, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 14, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 07, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 07, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • November 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 06, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 19, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 19, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 17, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 17, 2018: [Order]
  • October 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 15, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 11, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 10, 2018: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • October 02, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • October 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 01, 2018: [Continue]
  • October 01, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Show Cause Hearing]
  • September 24, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • September 24, 2018: [Notice]
  • September 21, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 21, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • September 19, 2018: [Hearing]
  • September 19, 2018: [Request]
  • September 19, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 19, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 19, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 19, 2018: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • September 18, 2018: [Psychiatric Report Received]
  • September 17, 2018: [Arrest]
  • September 14, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 04, 2018: [Order to Show Cause]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • July 14, 2018: [Transcript - Redacted]
May, 2018
  • May 02, 2018: [Transcript Redaction Request]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Transcript Redaction Request]
  • April 16, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • April 16, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 12, 2018: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • April 12, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • April 12, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • April 12, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • April 11, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • April 11, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • April 11, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • March 21, 2018: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • March 21, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 20, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 19, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 19, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 19, 2018: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 19, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 09, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • March 09, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 09, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 08, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 08, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 07, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • March 07, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • March 06, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 06, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 06, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 05, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 05, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 05, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 28, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 28, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 27, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • February 27, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 14, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • February 14, 2018: [Order for Summons - Probation Request]
  • February 14, 2018: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 14, 2018: [Request for Summons]
  • February 13, 2018: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • February 13, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • February 12, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • January 26, 2018: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • January 05, 2018: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • January 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 04, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Extend]
  • December 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • December 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • December 08, 2017: [Furlough]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Order]
  • November 29, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • November 21, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • November 17, 2017: [Hearing]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 20, 2017: [Amended Plea Agreement]
  • October 20, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 20, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Competency Evaluation]
  • October 06, 2017: [Consent]
  • October 06, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • October 04, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • October 03, 2017: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 27, 2017: [Competency Evaluation]
  • September 22, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 22, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • September 15, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 15, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 15, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 15, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 11, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 06, 2017: [Sentencing]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 30, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 30, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 29, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 11, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 09, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 29, 2017: [Order]
  • June 29, 2017: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • June 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • June 29, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 29, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 28, 2017: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • June 28, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
  • June 27, 2017: [Release from Custody]
  • June 23, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 23, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 23, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 23, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 19, 2017: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • June 16, 2017: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • June 06, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • May 26, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 26, 2017: [Transcript]
  • May 23, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • April 25, 2017: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • April 18, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 13, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 13, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 12, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • April 12, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • April 10, 2017: [Arrest]
  • April 07, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Transport Defendant]
  • March 20, 2017: [Transport Defendant]
  • March 20, 2017: [Request]
  • March 09, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • March 03, 2017: [Response to Motion]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Extend]
  • February 27, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 22, 2017: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • February 22, 2017: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • February 21, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 21, 2017: [Sever Defendant]
  • February 21, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 17, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • February 17, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 17, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 17, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • February 15, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 15, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 13, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 02, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Order Referring Motion]
  • January 30, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 30, 2017: [Bill of Particulars]
  • January 20, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 17, 2017: [Order Referring Motion]
  • January 05, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • January 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • December 28, 2016: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 28, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 27, 2016: [Extend]
  • December 23, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 22, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 20, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 20, 2016: [Suppress]
  • December 19, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 19, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 14, 2016: [Request]
  • December 12, 2016: [Request]
  • December 09, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 09, 2016: [Request]
  • December 09, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • December 09, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • December 09, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 09, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 09, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 09, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • December 08, 2016: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • December 08, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 08, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • December 07, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 07, 2016: [Request]
  • December 06, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 06, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 06, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 06, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 06, 2016: [Text Order]
  • December 06, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • December 06, 2016: [Indictment]
  • December 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.