U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 16-50299
  • Case Name: Deanna Mae Click
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (Text Order)]
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Final Report Following Dismissal]
January, 2019
  • January 12, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismissing Case (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
June, 2018
  • June 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 16, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modify Confirmed Plan]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Proof of Claim]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 21, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • May 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modify Confirmed Plan]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Claim]
November, 2017
  • November 10, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 08, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
October, 2017
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
September, 2017
  • September 15, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reminder for Filing Application for Fees]
August, 2017
  • August 17, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 15, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • August 15, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan as Confirmed]
  • August 15, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - Hrng Held (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • August 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • August 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
  • August 09, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Order Request]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
April, 2017
  • April 11, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Service (Text Entry)]
  • April 11, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • April 11, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Motion to Reschedule Hearing]
  • April 03, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Trustee Following Conversion (Text Order)]
  • February 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • February 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • February 17, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income Form 122C-2]
  • February 17, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income Form 122C-2]
  • February 17, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
  • February 17, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
  • February 17, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • February 17, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Plan]
  • February 12, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 12, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 10, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds]
  • February 10, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds]
  • February 10, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • February 10, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • February 10, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Convert Case to 13]
  • February 10, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Convert Case to 13]
  • February 10, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amendment to Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • February 10, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amendment to Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • February 10, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Convert Case to 13 (no fee required)]
  • February 10, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Convert Case to 13 (no fee required)]
  • February 10, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Convert Case to 13 (no fee required)]
  • February 10, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • February 10, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Response]
  • February 10, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Response]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Dismiss Case 707(b) by UST]
  • January 12, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 10, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Presumed Abuse]
  • January 09, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • January 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • January 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 15, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 08, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 06, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • December 06, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • December 06, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Update Deficiency Deadline(s)]
  • December 06, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • December 06, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 06, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 06, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.