U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40128-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chavarria-Garcia
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 20, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 17, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 16, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 16, 2017: [Sentencing]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 16, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 14, 2017: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 24, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 17, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 03, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • December 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • December 09, 2016: [Discovery]
  • December 07, 2016: [Oral Order]
  • December 06, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • December 06, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.