U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40130-1
  • Case Name: USA v. VanEmmerik
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [Response]
  • February 02, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 01, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • February 01, 2021: [Notice]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2020
  • November 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 09, 2020: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • October 09, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • October 06, 2020: [Response]
  • October 02, 2020: [Continue]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Supplement]
  • September 15, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Admission]
  • September 14, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • September 14, 2020: [Admission]
  • September 14, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • September 10, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Declaration of Publication]
June, 2018
  • June 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • May 29, 2018: [Forfeiture]
  • May 29, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2018
  • March 16, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 16, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 15, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • March 14, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 12, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 02, 2018: [Continue]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 27, 2018: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • February 22, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 22, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 22, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 12, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • February 12, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 01, 2018: [Order]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 11, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 11, 2017: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
  • December 11, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 29, 2017: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • November 13, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 23, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • October 18, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 18, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 18, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 17, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2017
  • August 01, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
July, 2017
  • July 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 18, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2017
  • May 16, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 03, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2017
  • January 03, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 27, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 09, 2016: [Request]
  • December 09, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 08, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 08, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • December 08, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • December 08, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • December 08, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 08, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 08, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 08, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 08, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • December 08, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 07, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 07, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 07, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 06, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • December 06, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.