U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50164-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bauer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • April 27, 2021: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
January, 2020
  • January 07, 2020: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
December, 2019
  • December 02, 2019: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
January, 2018
  • January 23, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 21, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 20, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 20, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • November 20, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • November 20, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 15, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
October, 2017
  • October 02, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 26, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 26, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 26, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 17, 2017: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • August 16, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • August 16, 2017: [Transcript]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 06, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • June 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 06, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • June 06, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
May, 2017
  • May 19, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 19, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 19, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • May 19, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 19, 2017: [Waiver]
  • May 16, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 15, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 15, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 15, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
April, 2017
  • April 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • April 14, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 12, 2017: [Furlough]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 13, 2017: [Continue]
  • February 13, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 20, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • January 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Extend]
  • December 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 22, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 20, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 20, 2016: [Continue]
  • December 20, 2016: [Suppress]
  • December 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • December 12, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 07, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 06, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • December 06, 2016: [Text Order]
  • December 06, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • December 06, 2016: [Indictment]
  • December 06, 2016: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.