U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cv-05112
  • Case Name: Thompson et al v. Kreutz et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [Order]
  • April 18, 2017: [Judgment]
  • April 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2017
  • February 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
January, 2017
  • January 04, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Mail Returned]
  • December 15, 2016: [Remark]
  • December 15, 2016: [Mail Returned]
  • December 07, 2016: [Letter Sent]
  • December 07, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 06, 2016: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 06, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.