U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 16-50302
  • Case Name: Alan Ray Bramson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 10, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
March, 2017
  • March 09, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
February, 2017
  • February 20, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Limited Filers only)]
  • February 10, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • February 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
January, 2017
  • January 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • January 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • December 29, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Schedule H]
  • December 29, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Schedule G]
  • December 29, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Schedule D]
  • December 22, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reduced Notice]
  • December 22, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
  • December 22, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Dismiss Case]
  • December 09, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 08, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (deactivated)]
  • December 07, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Receipt of Filing Fee]
  • December 07, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Corrective Entry]
  • December 07, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • December 07, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • December 07, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • December 07, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • December 07, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 07, 2016: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.